Senate | 06/03/2024 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | amended on third reading 3241a | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | ordered to third reading cal.90 | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2023 | advanced to third reading cal.166 | ||
Assembly | 04/26/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 02/02/2023 | referred to insurance |