Assembly | 05/28/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.150 | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | rules report cal.150 | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2023 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2023 | print number 3283a | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2023 | amend and recommit to housing | ||
Assembly | 02/02/2023 | referred to housing |