Assembly | 11/17/2023 | approval memo.24 | ||
Assembly | 11/17/2023 | signed chap.639 | ||
Assembly | 11/13/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/10/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/10/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/10/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.1073 | ||
Senate | 06/10/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1051A | ||
Senate | 06/10/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | amended on third reading 3301a | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.338 | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | rules report cal.338 | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2023 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 02/02/2023 | referred to governmental operations |