Assembly | 09/15/2023 | signed chap.380 | ||
Assembly | 09/07/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.1616 | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S368 | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | home rule request | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.572 | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | rules report cal.572 | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | amend by restoring to original print 3313 | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2023 | print number 3313a | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2023 | amend (t) and recommit to local governments | ||
Assembly | 02/02/2023 | referred to local governments |