Assembly | 06/10/2023 | substituted by s2500b | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2023 | rules report cal.809 | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | print number 3316b | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | amend and recommit to real property taxation | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2023 | print number 3316a | ||
Assembly | 02/02/2023 | referred to real property taxation |