Assembly | 06/09/2023 | substituted by s7400 | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.751 | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | rules report cal.751 | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/19/2023 | print number 3327a | ||
Assembly | 05/19/2023 | amend and recommit to real property taxation | ||
Assembly | 02/02/2023 | referred to real property taxation |