Assembly | 11/10/2023 | signed chap.611 | ||
Assembly | 11/09/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.1552 | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7461 | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.495 | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | rules report cal.495 | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2023 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2023 | print number 3381a | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2023 | amend and recommit to real property taxation | ||
Assembly | 02/02/2023 | referred to real property taxation |