Assembly | 11/17/2023 | tabled | ||
Assembly | 11/17/2023 | vetoed memo.44 | ||
Assembly | 11/13/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.1087 | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3586A | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.439 | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | rules report cal.439 | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2023 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2023 | print number 3403a | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2023 | amend and recommit to veterans' affairs | ||
Assembly | 02/03/2023 | referred to veterans' affairs |