Assembly | 06/08/2023 | substituted by s225b | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | rules report cal.686 | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | reference changed to judiciary | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2023 | print number 3412b | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2023 | amend and recommit to correction | ||
Assembly | 04/21/2023 | opinion referred to judiciary | ||
Assembly | 04/10/2023 | to attorney-general for opinion | ||
Assembly | 04/04/2023 | print number 3412a | ||
Assembly | 02/03/2023 | referred to correction |