Assembly | 11/22/2024 | tabled | ||
Assembly | 11/22/2024 | vetoed memo.23 | ||
Assembly | 11/15/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.1126 | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1611A | ||
Senate | 05/23/2024 | REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.96 | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2024 | rules report cal.96 | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2024 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | referred to racing and wagering | ||
Assembly | 04/05/2023 | print number 3475a | ||
Assembly | 04/05/2023 | amend and recommit to racing and wagering |