Assembly | 06/10/2023 | substituted by s5795a | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | amended on third reading 3486a | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | recalled from senate | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.441 | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | rules report cal.441 | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2023 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 02/03/2023 | referred to real property taxation |