Assembly | 06/07/2024 | substituted by s5808a | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | rules report cal.592 | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2024 | print number 3498a | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2024 | amend and recommit to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2023 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 02/03/2023 | referred to judiciary |