Assembly | 09/29/2023 | approval memo.10 | ||
Assembly | 09/29/2023 | signed chap.506 | ||
Assembly | 09/29/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.752 | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2779 | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING | ||
Assembly | 03/13/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 03/13/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 03/09/2023 | advanced to third reading cal.49 | ||
Assembly | 03/08/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 02/03/2023 | referred to ways and means |