Assembly | 12/21/2024 | approval memo.53 | ||
Assembly | 12/21/2024 | signed chap.611 | ||
Assembly | 12/12/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.930 | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8745 | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2024 | referred to children and families | ||
Assembly | 04/12/2024 | advanced to third reading cal.403 | ||
Assembly | 04/12/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 03/19/2024 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 03/07/2024 | print number 3580a | ||
Assembly | 03/07/2024 | amend and recommit to children and families |