LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
New York NY
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
A03652
Action History
NY
New York Assembly Bill A03652
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Assembly Bill A03652
Action History
Assembly
03/13/2023
substituted by s2076
Assembly
03/09/2023
advanced to third reading cal.51
Assembly
03/08/2023
reported
Assembly
02/15/2023
reported referred to ways and means
Assembly
02/03/2023
referred to racing and wagering