Assembly | 12/23/2024 | tabled | ||
Assembly | 12/21/2024 | vetoed memo.115 | ||
Assembly | 12/12/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.1106 | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2984 | ||
Assembly | 04/03/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 04/03/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | REFERRED TO HEALTH | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | ordered to third reading cal.94 | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.340 | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | rules report cal.340 | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 03/28/2023 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2023 | reported referred to codes |