Assembly | 09/27/2024 | signed chap.337 | ||
Assembly | 09/20/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.810 | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5441 | ||
Senate | 05/23/2024 | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.97 | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2024 | rules report cal.97 | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/21/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | referred to governmental operations |