Assembly | 09/27/2023 | signed chap.491 | ||
Assembly | 09/26/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.1009 | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5527 | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION | ||
Assembly | 03/09/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 03/09/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 03/02/2023 | advanced to third reading cal.41 | ||
Assembly | 02/28/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 02/07/2023 | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |