Assembly | 01/16/2024 | committed to health | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | ordered to third reading cal.96 | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.216 | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | rules report cal.216 | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2023 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 02/07/2023 | referred to health |