Assembly | 06/10/2023 | substituted by s1039a | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.620 | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2023 | rules report cal.620 | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2023 | reported referred to codes | ||
Assembly | 05/19/2023 | print number 3748a | ||
Assembly | 05/19/2023 | amend and recommit to governmental employees | ||
Assembly | 02/07/2023 | referred to governmental employees |