LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
New York NY
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
A03769
Action History
NY
New York Assembly Bill A03769
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Assembly Bill A03769
Action History
Assembly
06/06/2024
substituted by s179a
Assembly
02/12/2024
amended on third reading 3769a
Assembly
01/03/2024
ordered to third reading cal.98
Assembly
02/16/2023
advanced to third reading cal.17
Assembly
02/14/2023
reported
Assembly
02/07/2023
referred to governmental employees