Assembly | 05/11/2023 | signed chap.131 | ||
Assembly | 05/11/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.543 | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2123 | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | REFERRED TO FINANCE | ||
Assembly | 03/09/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 03/09/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 03/02/2023 | advanced to third reading cal.42 | ||
Assembly | 02/27/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 02/08/2023 | referred to agriculture |