Assembly | 06/03/2024 | substituted by s1736e | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | rules report cal.308 | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2024 | print number 3780e | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2024 | amend and recommit to codes | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2024 | print number 3780d | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | referred to codes | ||
Assembly | 05/26/2023 | print number 3780c | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2023 | reported referred to codes | ||
Assembly | 05/19/2023 | print number 3780b | ||
Assembly | 05/19/2023 | amend and recommit to governmental operations | ||
Assembly | 05/05/2023 | print number 3780a | ||
Assembly | 05/05/2023 | amend (t) and recommit to governmental operations | ||
Assembly | 02/08/2023 | referred to governmental operations |