LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
New York NY
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
A03818
Action History
NY
New York Assembly Bill A03818
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Assembly Bill A03818
Action History
Assembly
01/03/2024
referred to codes
Assembly
05/31/2023
reported referred to rules
Assembly
05/24/2023
reported referred to codes
Assembly
05/19/2023
print number 3818a
Assembly
05/19/2023
amend (t) and recommit to housing
Assembly
02/08/2023
referred to housing