LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
New York NY
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
A03978
Action History
NY
New York Assembly Bill A03978
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Assembly Bill A03978
Action History
Assembly
03/11/2024
amended on third reading 3978b
Assembly
01/08/2024
amended on third reading (t) 3978a
Assembly
01/03/2024
ordered to third reading cal.104
Assembly
03/16/2023
advanced to third reading cal.61
Assembly
03/15/2023
reported
Assembly
02/08/2023
referred to codes