Senate | 02/07/2024 | REFERRED TO WOMEN'S ISSUES | ||
Assembly | 02/07/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 02/07/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | ordered to third reading cal.105 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | DIED IN SENATE | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.218 | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | rules report cal.218 | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 02/08/2023 | referred to health |