Assembly | 06/28/2024 | signed chap.122 | ||
Assembly | 06/26/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 05/29/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/29/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/29/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.1013 | ||
Senate | 05/29/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8796 | ||
Senate | 05/23/2024 | REFERRED TO DISABILITIES | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 02/29/2024 | advanced to third reading cal.326 | ||
Assembly | 02/28/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | referred to education |