Assembly | 12/12/2023 | signed chap.722 | ||
Assembly | 12/12/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.1637 | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4671 | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | REFERRED TO CODES | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.443 | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | rules report cal.443 | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | reported referred to codes | ||
Assembly | 02/08/2023 | referred to transportation |