Assembly | 01/03/2024 | ordered to third reading cal.106 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | DIED IN SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.444 | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | rules report cal.444 | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | reported referred to codes | ||
Assembly | 02/08/2023 | referred to transportation |