Assembly | 06/20/2023 | substituted by s2943b | ||
Assembly | 06/20/2023 | rules report cal.863 | ||
Assembly | 06/20/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/19/2023 | print number 4047b | ||
Assembly | 05/19/2023 | amend and recommit to housing | ||
Assembly | 04/25/2023 | print number 4047a | ||
Assembly | 02/09/2023 | referred to housing |