Assembly | 08/26/2024 | signed chap.227 | ||
Assembly | 08/26/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.1759 | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5910B | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | REFERRED TO WOMEN'S ISSUES | ||
Assembly | 04/03/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 04/03/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 01/08/2024 | amended on third reading (t) 4060a | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | ordered to third reading cal.110 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | DIED IN SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/17/2023 | REFERRED TO FINANCE | ||
Assembly | 03/23/2023 | advanced to third reading cal.81 | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 02/09/2023 | referred to health |