Assembly | 05/30/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.236 | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | rules report cal.236 | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2024 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/21/2024 | print number 4062a | ||
Assembly | 05/21/2024 | amend (t) and recommit to election law | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | referred to election law |