Assembly | 09/04/2024 | signed chap.301 | ||
Assembly | 09/04/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.459 | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5085C | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Assembly | 03/27/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 03/27/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Senate | 03/27/2024 | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION | ||
Assembly | 02/12/2024 | amended on third reading 4066b | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | ordered to third reading cal.112 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | DIED IN SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | REFERRED TO FINANCE | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.446 | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | rules report cal.446 | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 03/23/2023 | print number 4066a | ||
Assembly | 03/23/2023 | amend and recommit to transportation |