Assembly | 05/30/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.237 | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | rules report cal.237 | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/07/2024 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2024 | print number 4071b | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2024 | amend and recommit to governmental operations | ||
Assembly | 05/01/2024 | print number 4071a | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | referred to governmental operations |