Assembly | 11/11/2024 | signed chap.444 | ||
Assembly | 11/08/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.1645 | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6469A | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.238 | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | rules report cal.238 | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | reported | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/21/2024 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/03/2024 | print number 4089a | ||
Assembly | 05/03/2024 | amend and recommit to transportation | ||
Assembly | 01/16/2024 | committed to transportation | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | ordered to third reading cal.114 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | DIED IN SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.623 | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2023 | rules report cal.623 |