Assembly | 12/11/2024 | approval memo.23 | ||
Assembly | 12/11/2024 | signed chap.549 | ||
Assembly | 12/02/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.146 | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4667A | ||
Assembly | 05/29/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/29/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/29/2024 | referred to children and families | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.151 | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | rules report cal.151 | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2024 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/10/2024 | print number 4099a | ||
Assembly | 05/10/2024 | amend (t) and recommit to children and families |