Assembly | 10/17/2023 | signed chap.530 | ||
Assembly | 10/13/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.855 | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6063 | ||
Assembly | 03/27/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 03/27/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | REFERRED TO HEALTH | ||
Assembly | 03/23/2023 | advanced to third reading cal.82 | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2023 | reported |