Assembly | 06/06/2024 | substituted by s885c | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | rules report cal.480 | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | print number 4130c | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | amend and recommit to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/21/2024 | reported referred to codes | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2024 | print number 4130b | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2024 | amend (t) and recommit to housing | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | referred to housing | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | print number 4130a | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | amend and recommit to housing |