Assembly | 12/13/2024 | approval memo.27 | ||
Assembly | 12/13/2024 | signed chap.555 | ||
Assembly | 12/02/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.1342 | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S593A | ||
Senate | 05/29/2024 | REFERRED TO HEALTH | ||
Assembly | 05/29/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/29/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.152 | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | rules report cal.152 | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2023 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2023 | reference changed to health | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2023 | print number 4138a | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2023 | amend (t) and recommit to mental health | ||
Assembly | 02/10/2023 | referred to mental health |