Assembly | 11/22/2024 | tabled | ||
Assembly | 11/22/2024 | vetoed memo.25 | ||
Assembly | 11/15/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.1204 | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7501 | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS | ||
Assembly | 02/07/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 02/07/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | ordered to third reading cal.116 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | DIED IN SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.624 | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2023 | rules report cal.624 | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/26/2023 | print number 4201b | ||
Assembly | 05/26/2023 | amend and recommit to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2023 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/12/2023 | print number 4201a | ||
Assembly | 05/12/2023 | amend (t) and recommit to veterans' affairs | ||
Assembly | 02/13/2023 | referred to veterans' affairs |