Assembly | 09/29/2023 | signed chap.507 | ||
Assembly | 09/19/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.1817 | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6706 | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Senate | 05/15/2023 | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION | ||
Assembly | 05/11/2023 | advanced to third reading cal.205 | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 04/25/2023 | reported referred to ways and means |