Assembly | 11/22/2024 | tabled | ||
Assembly | 11/22/2024 | vetoed memo.26 | ||
Assembly | 11/15/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.1345 | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4193 | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.309 | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | rules report cal.309 | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2024 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | referred to health |