Assembly | 11/17/2023 | tabled | ||
Assembly | 11/17/2023 | vetoed memo.45 | ||
Assembly | 11/13/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.1752 | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5980 | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.500 | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | rules report cal.500 | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 04/17/2023 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 02/14/2023 | referred to governmental operations |