Assembly | 09/27/2024 | signed chap.340 | ||
Assembly | 09/20/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.389 | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S722 | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION | ||
Assembly | 02/26/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 02/26/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 02/15/2024 | advanced to third reading cal.308 | ||
Assembly | 02/14/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2023 | reported referred to rules |