Assembly | 11/17/2023 | tabled | ||
Assembly | 11/17/2023 | vetoed memo.46 | ||
Assembly | 11/13/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.1635 | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3439 | ||
Senate | 05/09/2023 | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2023 | advanced to third reading cal.168 | ||
Assembly | 04/25/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 02/14/2023 | referred to energy |