Assembly | 11/20/2023 | approval memo.32 | ||
Assembly | 11/20/2023 | signed chap.672 | ||
Assembly | 11/13/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.1639 | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5069A | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2023 | advanced to third reading cal.171 | ||
Assembly | 04/25/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2023 | print number 4504a | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2023 | amend (t) and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2023 | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |