Assembly | 05/21/2024 | substituted by s4636 | ||
Assembly | 04/04/2024 | advanced to third reading cal.389 | ||
Assembly | 04/04/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2023 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2023 | referred to local governments |