Assembly | 11/22/2024 | tabled | ||
Assembly | 11/22/2024 | vetoed memo.27 | ||
Assembly | 11/15/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.1343 | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1520 | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Assembly | 02/28/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 02/28/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | REFERRED TO HEALTH | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | ordered to third reading cal.124 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | DIED IN SENATE | ||
Assembly | 03/23/2023 | advanced to third reading cal.85 | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2023 | reported |