Senate | 03/25/2024 | REFERRED TO FINANCE | ||
Assembly | 03/25/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 03/25/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | ordered to third reading cal.126 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | DIED IN SENATE | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS | ||
Assembly | 03/15/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.109 | ||
Assembly | 03/15/2023 | rules report cal.109 | ||
Assembly | 03/15/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 03/15/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 03/09/2023 | print number 4591a | ||
Assembly | 03/09/2023 | amend (t) and recommit to governmental operations | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2023 | referred to governmental operations |