Assembly | 06/21/2023 | substituted by s4712b | ||
Assembly | 06/21/2023 | rules report cal.875 | ||
Assembly | 06/21/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | reference changed to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | print number 4606b | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | amend and recommit to local governments | ||
Assembly | 03/30/2023 | print number 4606a | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2023 | referred to local governments |